Trustees WESTHOLME SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 526615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN CHRISTOPHER MARSDEN | Chair | 18 September 1995 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Northin | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Pippa Williamson | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sanjoy Bhattacharyya | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Gregory O'Neill | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Robinson-Hoy | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Anne Robinson | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER MCCANN | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Richard Dobrashian | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julie Meadows | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Backhouse | Trustee | 08 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BERRY | Trustee | 03 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
PETER GRAHAM FORREST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.