Financial history SIR JOHN DEANE'S COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.83k £11.28k £11.84k £13.65k £14.07k
Total expenditure £11.93k £11.88k £11.14k £13.09k £13.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A