Financial history THE EGREMONT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/12/2017 04/12/2018 04/12/2019 04/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £49 £51 £58 £56 £49
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A