Trustees FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Charity number: 526949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Anthony Punnet | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupert James Audland | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Laura Stonehouse | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Greifenberg | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Mary Skinner | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clive Christensen | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY SIMON WOOD | Trustee | 18 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.