Governing document THE LAKELAND ARTS TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13/12/1982 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11/05/1989 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07/04/1992 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/08/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 31/07/2013
Charitable objects
(A) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A PUBLIC ART GALLERY AND MUSEUM IN THE FORMER BOROUGH OF KENDAL, AND THE FORMER COUNTY OF WESTMORLAND AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS. (B) ANY OTHER PUBLIC CHARITABLE PURPOSES TENDING TO ADVANCE ARTISTIC HISTORICAL OR INTELLECTUAL INTERESTS IN THE SAID AREA WHICH CAN CONVENIENTLY BE PROMOTED IN COMBINATION WITH THE PURPOSE AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.