Trustees FARMER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 527636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher John Penney Chair
MARY BASS CHARITY
Received: On time
HOLBEACH AND EAST ELLOE HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
HOLBEACH COMMUNITY LARDER
Received: 5 days late
Donna Marie Allen Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Rev Sherine Victoria Angus Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Tracey Ann Carter Trustee 29 June 2021
HOLBEACH AND EAST ELLOE HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
WOMEN'S INSTITUTE HALL - HOLBEACH
Overdue by 212 days
Sophie Hutchinson Trustee 26 June 2019
None on record
Mary Dack Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record
ISOBEL HUTCHINSON Trustee 17 January 2013
None on record
JENNY WORTH Trustee
HISTORIC LINCOLN TRUST
Received: 73 days late
HOLBEACH CEMETERY CHAPELS LIMITED
Overdue by 243 days
THE A H WORTH CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 115 days
VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time