Accounts and annual returns OAKHAM SCHOOL RUTLAND
Charity number: 527825
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 20 March 2009 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 23 March 2009 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 18 June 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 14 April 2008 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 29 June 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 22 June 2007 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 30 June 2006 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 30 June 2006 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 30 June 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 28 June 2005 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window