Accounts and annual returns FULLHURST COMMUNITY COLLEGE PRIZE FUND

Charity number: 527832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required