ANN DAY'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 527968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 November 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 January 2020 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required