Trustees FRIENDS OF THE LAING ART GALLERY
Charity number: 528070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Elizabeth Scott | Chair | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HARDY | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN DEVINE | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Evans | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marian Green | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Thompson | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Cubbin | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Johnston | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Coleman | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marie Straughan | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Johnson | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Terence Michael Mc Laren | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Hazeldine | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.