Trustees THE YARLET TRUST
Charity number: 528618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Betteley | Chair | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Serena Goslett | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Jenna Scobie | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Susan Beech | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Samuel Cromwell Griffiths | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Eva Jean Cartwright | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Mark George Pickering | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Victoria Tomlinson | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Claire Jenkinson | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Jeremy Lefroy | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.