Accounts and annual returns THE NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE ART SOCIETY PRIZE FUND
Charity number: 528631
Charity reporting is overdue by 1800 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 339 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 339 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 704 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 704 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1069 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1069 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1434 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1434 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1800 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1800 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window