Trustees RUGBY SCHOOL
Charity number: 528752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Patrick Bacon | Chair | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Adam Habib | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rohin Aggarwal | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Coates | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
The Reverend Canon Dr Mark Pryce | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Wills | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Duncan Skailes | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Charles Barwell OBE | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Jason Alexander Elmhirst | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
General Tim Radford CB DSO OBE | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
John Moreland | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Marten | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
BARRY JOHN O'BRIEN | Trustee | 12 February 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.