Dogfen lywodraethu ASHORNE HILL MANAGEMENT COLLEGE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 OCTOBER 1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 MARCH 1986, 13 MARCH 1987, 10 MARCH 2000, 5 JUNE 2001, 19 DECEMBER 2001, 30 MARCH 2006 AND 5 JUNE 2008.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING AND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING, IN PARTICULAR THE RAISING OF THE STANDARDS OF MANAGEMENT SKILLS AND TECHNIQUES IN THE IRON AND STEEL INDUSTRY AND ASSOCIATED AND ANCILLARY INDUSTRIES BY THE ORGANISATION AND CONDUCT AT ASHORNE HILL AND ELSEWHERE OF A COLLEGE FOR MANAGEMENT EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.