Trustees ANGLICAN CHAPLAINCY TRUST
Charity number: 528993
Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Revd Dr Sharon Jones | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Mann | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Slater | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN ASHTON | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
The Revd Canon Dr Robin Mark Pryce | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
The Revd Professor Hugh Alexander Gervase Houghton | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Guy Hordern | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
THE REVEREND DR CHRISTOPHER ALFRED KENT | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.