Accounts and annual returns HILL HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 529420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 15 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 September 2020 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 October 2019 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 16 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window