Financial history SIR JOHN COUSIN HORSFALL BARONET EXHIBITIONS

Charity number: 529488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £429 £427 £593 £355 £283
Total expenditure £690 £400 £0 £600 £300
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A