CHARITIES IN CONNECTION WITH NEWLAND CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL

Charity number: 529773
Charity reporting is overdue by 1761 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/01/2015
Total gross income £22.44k £20.01k £22.02k £24.36k £15.43k
Total expenditure £27.37k £19.09k £16.27k £23.53k £19.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0