Governing document THE MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENTS' SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 5 JULY 1966 AS AMENDED 3 OCTOBER 1967, 3 OCTOBER 1977 AMENDED 31 OCTOBER 1983 AND 6 NOVEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY SHALL SEEK TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL ("THE SCHOOL") BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THEIR ACADEMIC, SPORTING, CULTURAL, RECREATIONAL AND OUTDOOR PURSUIT ACTIVITIES INCLUDING IMPROVEMENTS TO THE SCHOOL ENVIRONMENT AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT TO: A)ENCOURAGE FRIENDLY RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS, PUPILS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL (INCLUDING PAST PUPILS, STAFF AND FAMILIES); AND B)ENGAGE IN SOCIAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WHICH HAVE THE PRIOR APPROVAL OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.