Trustees THE CHETHAM SOCIETY FOR THE PUBLICATION OF REMAINS HISTORICAL AND LITERARY CONNECTED WITH THE PALATINE COUNTIES OF LANCASTER AND CHESTER
Charity number: 700047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Philip Joseph Morgan | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|||||
DR S J HARRIS | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr P Shapely | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR T J THORNTON | Trustee | 07 May 2002 |
|
|||||
MS D J LAVER | Trustee | 01 May 2001 |
|
|||||
DR A G CROSBY | Trustee | 26 April 1994 |
|
|
||||
DR D J CLAYTON | Trustee | 29 October 1991 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL HOWSON WILLIAM BOOTH | Trustee | 01 June 1983 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.