Governing document BEACONS: THE DEVELOPMENT EDUCATION CENTRE FOR HEREFORDSHIRE AND WORCESTERSHIRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/04/1988 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/2000 AS AMENDED ON 24/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 04/09/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN - (1) UNDERSTANDING THE PEOPLE OF THE COUNTRIES OF THE WORLD AND THE MATERIAL AND FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OF SUCH PEOPLE; (2) THE CUSTOMS, TRADITIONS, BELIEFS, SOCIAL SYSTEMS, VALUES, HISTORY GEOGRAPHY AND GOVERNMENT OF SUCH PEOPLE; (3) THE ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH COUNTRIES INCLUDING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND GLOBAL INDEPENDENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.