Trustees TIMBERSBROOK WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity number: 700189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Parton | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Patricia Bussey | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE WAKEFIELD | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ANNE HORNSEY | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE DIXON | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA COOK | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Gartland | Trustee | 05 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.