Financial history THE GOVERNORS' FUND OF ST THOMAS MORE SCHOOL

Charity number: 700354
Charity reporting is overdue by 1486 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £4.90k £5.64k £2.76k £1.28k £3.32k
Total expenditure £4.90k £5.64k £2.76k £1.28k £3.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A