Governing document MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THERAPY CENTRE (SOUTH YORKSHIRE) LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JANUARY 1988 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 APRIL 1988 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 MARCH 1997 CERT OF INCORP UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/09/2001 as amended on 17 Apr 2019 as amended on 26 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO AID AND IMPROVE THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THE CONDITION OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, BY ANY LAWFUL MEANS,IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE,NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE,NORTH NOTTINGHAMSHIRE,WEST LINCOLNSHIRE OR SUCH OTHER PART OR PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE COMPANY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
PLEASE SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.