Trustees National Horseracing College Limited
Charity number: 700405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francis Stephenson | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Callum Helliwell | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Iggulden | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Frampton | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Sutcliffe | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNAH CORDELIA GILL | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
THE HONOURABLE OLIVER GREENALL | Trustee | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEFF ENNIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES HETHERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIM LYLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.