Financial history THE KING'S CHURCH

Charity number: 700457
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £109.05k £83.74k £80.53k £91.51k £80.55k
Total expenditure £61.59k £115.47k £63.78k £67.33k £47.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A