Governing document NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH
Charity number: 700676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 SEPTEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED 19 NOVEMBER 1989, 14 FEBRUARY 1993, 26 FEBRUARY 1995 AND 22 APRIL 2001.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG PERSONS OF THE CHINESE RACE IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.