BRIDGEWOOD TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 700843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.75m £5.18m £6.27m £5.59m £6.24m
Total expenditure £4.37m £4.66m £4.94m £5.32m £5.14m
Income from government contracts £4.18m £5.04m £4.70m £4.78m £5.85m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £300.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £13.82k £14.94k £807.02k £7.48k £3.18k
Income - Other trading activities £532.87k £549.81k £572.84k £578.93k £568.42k
Income - Charitable activities £4.18m £4.60m £4.87m £4.96m £5.52m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.63k £16.15k £28.07k £41.49k £59.87k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £88.15k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £800.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.95m £4.23m £4.46m £4.80m £4.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £419.41k £433.38k £480.37k £515.20k £377.98k
Expenditure - Governance £12.57k £16.50k £12.76k £12.76k £12.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £90.10k