Trustees THE FRIENDS OF FOOTHERLEY HALL
Charity number: 700919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Johnson | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Green | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Webb | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stella Forsdike | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Johnson | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Thomas | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Sawbridge | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Francis Kerrigan | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Ulyatt | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Darby | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Pocock | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.