Financial history ANN COBB

Charity number: 701136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.48k £1.36k £1.36k £2.08k £1.50k
Total expenditure £5.39k £350 £829 £1.77k £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A