Trustees HOLBEACH AND EAST ELLOE HOSPITAL TRUST
Charity number: 701458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John Penney | Chair | 21 August 2015 |
|
|||||||
Helen Aedy | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Inns | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Walmsley | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Dalton | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kim Wing | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Johnson | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mike Harrison | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Sherine Angus | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
James Barry Earnshaw | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Tracey Ann Carter | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Lady JULIA AILEEN TAYLOR | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.