Trustees ACTIVE CHESHIRE
Charity number: 701764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Bryan Pearson | Chair | 22 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Jonathan Wogel | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Anne Underhill | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH ALEXANDER ONIONS | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Michael Sullivan | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Anne Morris-Bates | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Thompson | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Lancaster | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Law-Lyons | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Waterman | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.