GUISBOROUGH CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 702049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £37.11k £32.66k £26.79k £22.43k £19.19k
Total expenditure £26.22k £24.12k £38.24k £41.95k £37.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A