Trustees SOLIHULL SCHOOL PARENT'S ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 702099
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suchvinder Naga | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Gooderidge | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Brough | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aneesa Ahmed | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aparna Sharma | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Freyja Ellard | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Narvinder Kaur | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Meena Jindal | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Matthew Clark | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Seager | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Spiers | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Griffiths | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jo Belcuore-Groutage | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Lunt | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Jones | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jones | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Whitfield | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sue Cole | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SEAN ANDREW MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.