THE GREENFIELDS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 702308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.10m £1.03m £1.09m £1.11m £1.00m
Total expenditure £940.17k £1.00m £1.06m £1.11m £1.11m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.02m £1.09m £1.11m £998.69k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £922 £734 £398 £1.63k £2.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £759.90k £983.90k £1.04m £1.09m £1.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £17.89k £18.95k £19.31k £19.40k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £180.27k £0 £0 £0 £0