Trustees 1ST WOLDS SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 702351
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graeme Baxter | Chair | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Andrew Birchall | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Bradshaw | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jon Borzacchiello | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Chapman | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Coote | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marisa Heald | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Arnold | Trustee | 27 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Hickling | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Graham Blount | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Shaun Alan Black | Trustee | 01 June 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.