14TH HARROGATE (WOODLANDS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 702790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.87k £14.81k £14.04k £16.49k £11.91k
Total expenditure £20.40k £14.50k £12.30k £14.60k £15.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A