Financial history THE PICKERING PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/04/2017 08/04/2018 08/04/2019 08/04/2020 08/04/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A