Charity overview JAMES SCARLETT
Charity number: 212842-3
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 20 APRIL 1917
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
PARISH OF METFIELD
Registration history
- 27 November 1962: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 January 2011: Standard registration
- 09 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.