Trustees WOOLSTORE COUNTRY THEATRE
Charity number: 800154
Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angus Robert Bramwell | Chair | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Lorimer | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Johnson | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Nash | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Biggs | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Walker | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Thorton | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Katharine Eileen Lorimer | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DIANE HARVEY | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NORTH | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ARCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.