Financial history ONGAR PLACE PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (ONGAR PLACE PTFA)

Charity number: 800218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £11.12k £6.08k £12.69k £5.38k £3.22k
Total expenditure £10.32k £2.55k £7.36k £9.25k £2.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A