Trustees RICHMOND GYMNASTICS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 800253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Simon Geoffery Long | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Green | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Hewitt | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Kimberley | Trustee | 25 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Campbell | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SALLY WILSON | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Gilbert | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE JANE CASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS CHRIS BROCKBANK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.