Financial history FRANCIS FORTESQUE URQUHART MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 800281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £992 £3.04k £1.10k £1.16k £934
Total expenditure £1.42k £1.61k £1.60k £2.84k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A