Trustees NORTH LONDON DEAF CHILDRENS SOCIETY

Charity number: 800507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kanwaljit Makram Chair 15 January 2017
None on record
Natali Rachel Collins Trustee 14 June 2021
None on record
Nosheen Akhtar Trustee 14 June 2021
None on record
Pari Kotecha Trustee 09 March 2020
None on record
Marvi Rauf Trustee 09 March 2020
None on record
Rayan Ramez Basma Trustee 14 January 2019
None on record
Barbara Kasperska Trustee 11 March 2017
None on record
Dr Zibiah Alfred Loakthar Trustee 11 March 2017
None on record
Donna Apparicio Trustee 10 October 2016
None on record
Sukhvinder Gill Trustee 19 January 2015
None on record
LAUREN RAPACIOLI Trustee 10 July 2012
None on record
LINDA SELLS Trustee
None on record
DENIS COELHO Trustee
None on record
ESTHER REBECCA CONWAY Trustee
LAYCOCK PRIMARY SCHOOL AND UNIT FOR HEARING IMPAIRED CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 76 days