THE ST NICHOLAS GREAT WILBRAHAM TRUST

Charity number: 800524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.86k £23.93k £5.91k £10.17k £8.39k
Total expenditure £46.24k £33.19k £0 £11.71k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A