MARY FREEMAN BRAITHWAITE BEQUEST

Charity number: 800588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.49k £2.74k £1.15k £3.69k £1.36k
Total expenditure £11.57k £1.58k £32.36k £9.52k £10.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A