Governing document Plymouth Arts Cinema
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28/10/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 1999 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 OCTOBER 2009. as amended on 19 Mar 2019 as amended on 09 Dec 2021 as amended on 05 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AND LETTERS IN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH AND IN THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT WITHIN THE COUNTIES OF DEVON AND CORNWALL.
Area of benefit
DEVON AND CORNWALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.