Trustees THE RENAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 800733

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PAUL COCKWELL | Chair | 20 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Prof Timothy Bowen | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof James Burton | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathrine Parker | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof John Sayer | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Ancliffe | Trustee | 20 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Morlidge | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Alan Salama | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER LAWRENCE | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Jan Dudley | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katie Vinen | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Silver | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.