RESPOND

Charity number: 800862
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 November 2016 On time Download