Governing document Inclusive Community Church
Charity number: 801108

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED 8 JANUARY 1989, 13 SEPTEMBER 1998 AND 8 FEBRUARY 2009. as amended on 22 Apr 2018 as amended on 22 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTE THE GOSPEL OF CHRIST IN BOURNEMOUTH AND ELSEWHERE 2. RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BOURNEMOUTH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.